judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MARTIN FLYNN v. PAN AMERICAN HOTEL COMPANY

Case: A-180
A-180
05/16/1944
Application for Writ of Error
MARTIN FLYNN
PAN AMERICAN HOTEL COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/22/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/23/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/01/1944Response to Motion filed
11/22/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/31/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/31/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/23/1944Response to Petition
05/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/16/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Martin FlynnPetitioner
Pan American Hotel CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information