judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HEATH, WILLIAM P. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0453
Short Caption:HEATH, WILLIAM P. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3638-80Filed Date:03/23/1981

Opening Event Date:03/23/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/03/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/30/1982
Argued/Submitted:11/04/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HEATH, WILLIAM P. UNITED STATES
03/23/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/03/1982FiledRecord Completed
08/30/1982FiledBriefing Completed
11/04/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/12/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition