judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURKE VS. MYERS

Case Information: 32236
Short Caption:BURKE VS. MYERSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/27/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/27/1998Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Petitioner's Application for Extraordinary Writ of Certiorari.
04/27/1998Other Other. Received Proper Person Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis.
06/22/1998Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Change of Address for appellant Donna Joanne Burke.
07/09/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The Real Party in Interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. We further direct the real party in interest to include as exhibits to its answer all pertinent pleadings in the justices' and district courts. 1We direct the clerk of this court to amend to docket in this case as set forth in this order, to include the respondent district judge and the real party in interest in the caption. (Case cards corrected).
07/09/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. (Sat in district Court Proceedings).
10/04/1999Other Other. Received proper person Notice of Default -- Motion for Confession of Error -- Request for Dispostition.
01/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Requesting Documents. Total Rehab has failed to respond in any way to the order of July 9, 1999. Petitioners shall have 30 days from the date of this order to submit to this court file-stamped copies of all documents necessary to an understanding of the orders of the district and justices's courts (please see page 2 of order for documents).
05/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Submission of Documents. On January 21, 2000, we directed petitioners to supply this court with additional documentation, in compliance with NRAP 21(a), within 30 days of the date of the order. To date petitioners have failed to respond in any way to this order. Petitioners shall have 20 days to supply the documentation (Please see page 2 or order for documents). We caution petitioners that failure to submit the required documentation will result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned.
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Certiorari. We conclude that petitioners have abandoned this petition, and therefore " . . . deny the petition." fn1[Although petitioners were not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from petitioners.] NNP99B-RR/CY/DA
07/13/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Response to Court's Order Dated May 31, 2000. (Original only.)
10/01/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Although petitioners were not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from petitioners.] NNP00B-CY/DA/RR 01-16472
10/17/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-16547
10/17/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.