Case: PD-0652-01
PD-0652-01
04/23/2001
PDR Case Type
DAVIS, ERIC WAYNE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/13/2001 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
06/27/2001 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
06/27/2001 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/31/2001 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
04/23/2001 | PDR FILED | | |
04/23/2001 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/07/2001 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Davis, Eric Wayne | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | ERIC DAVIS |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Charles A. Rosenthal, Jr. |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-98-00967-CR
AFF 10-26-00
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
Honorable CAPRICE COSPER
745983