Case Information: 35619 | |||
Short Caption: | SKINNER (PAUL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40654 , 58166 , 59498 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR922105 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/28/2000 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/10/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). | 00-02147 | |
02/17/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-02512 | |
02/18/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: January 6, 2000. Court Reporter: Constance Eisenberg. | 00-02599 | |
02/22/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court docket entries. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/13/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. fn1[On February 18, 2000, the court reporter filed with this court a certified copy of the transcript of a proceeding held in the action below on January 6, 2000. In the event appellant does not intend to order any additional transcripts, he should file a certificate of no transcript request pursuant to NRAP 9(a).] | 00-03973 | |
03/16/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 00-04192 | |
06/07/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 6/7/00 (Reno/Carson). | 00-09584 | |
06/07/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 00-09585 | |
06/21/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 6/20/00. | 00-10602 | |
07/28/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/22/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We therefore " . . . affirm the district court's order dismissing appellant's petition." SNP00A-RR/CY/NB | 00-20535 | |
12/19/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-20761 | |
12/19/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 22, 2000. | 00-20761 |