Case: 09-99-00098-CV
09-99-00098-CV
03/02/1999
Miscellaneous civil
In the Matter of T.S.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/20/2000 | Case stored | | |
03/20/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/05/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
01/04/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
01/04/2000 | Mot-Ext to File Rehear Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/04/2000 | Mt for ext time to file Mt for Rehearing Filed | | |
12/02/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/29/1999 | Submitted | | |
11/29/1999 | Submission | | |
11/05/1999 | denying oral argument and put under 21 day subm | | |
10/28/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
10/28/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/01/1999 | Supplemental Record Filed | | |
09/28/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
09/17/1999 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/14/1999 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
08/12/1999 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/12/1999 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/29/1999 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
05/27/1999 | Letter | | |
05/13/1999 | Affidavit Filed | | |
04/15/1999 | Extension for record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/15/1999 | Extension for record filed by tc clerk, reporter | | |
03/15/1999 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
03/02/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/02/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/20/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Strother, Travis | Appellant | Christine Brown-Zeto |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Orange
Honorable Michael W. Shuff
3108
18 mon prob; 25 hours comm