Case Information: 83-CV-1175 | |||
Short Caption: | ROWLAND, ANTONIO N. CARTER, BARBARA | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA6745-82 | Filed Date: | 06/06/1983 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/06/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 07/16/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 07/17/1985 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 01/29/1986 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Antonio Rowland | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Barbara Carter | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | ROWLAND, ANTONIO N. CARTER, BARBARA | |||
01/01/1906 | VACATED WILLIAM BLAND SULLIVANW PRO BONO | |||
06/06/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
07/16/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/17/1985 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
01/29/1986 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/30/1986 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |