Case Information: 83-CV-1149 | |||
Short Caption: | BARRY JR., MARION S. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOSPITAL | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Lead: | 83-CV-1148 | Consolidated: | 83-CV-1149 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA1594-82 | Filed Date: | 09/12/1983 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/12/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/07/1983 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 03/05/1984 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 05/23/1984 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Amicus-Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N | |||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BARRY JR., MARION S. ET AL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION ET AL | |||
01/01/1906 | PYLESJ PRO HAC VICE | |||
09/12/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/07/1983 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
03/05/1984 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
05/23/1984 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
09/16/1985 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |