Case: B-22
B-22
01/03/1967
Application for Writ of Error
BILL LATHAM
JAMES D. DEMENT, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/12/1967 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
05/09/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/03/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/12/1967 | Reply to Response | | ||
05/09/1967 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/24/1967 | Order of the Court Issued | | ||
01/11/1967 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/09/1967 | Motion to dismiss | Overruled | | |
01/03/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
01/03/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bill Latham | Petitioner | |
James D. Dement, et ux. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information