Case: A-11825
A-11825
12/19/1966
Application for Writ of Error
DOROTHY GADDIS AND JOSEPH GADDIS
WILLIAM C. SMITH, STUART NEMIR, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/19/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
07/19/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
03/13/1967 | Supplement to Response | Respondent | | |
02/02/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/27/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/19/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/26/1967 | Letter Filed | | ||
07/19/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/19/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/05/1967 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
07/05/1967 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
07/05/1967 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/13/1967 | Supplement to Response | | ||
02/15/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/02/1967 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/27/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/19/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
12/19/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dorothy Gaddis and Joseph Gaddis | Petitioner | |
William C. Smith | Respondent | |
Stuart Nemir, Jr. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information