Case: B-10
B-10
12/19/1966
Application for Writ of Error
MARGUERITE LOVELETT NOWELL
AMES NOWELL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/15/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/13/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/02/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/1967 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/15/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/13/1967 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/02/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
01/02/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/19/1966 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Marguerite Lovelett Nowell | Petitioner | |
Ames Nowell | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information