Case: 03-0106
03-0106
02/03/2003
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
KLEIN & ASSOCIATES POLITICAL RELATIONS, KLEIN INVESTMENTS, SOUTHEAST TEXAS POLITICAL REVIEW AND PHILIP R. KLEIN
PORT ARTHUR INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, WILLIE MAE ELMORE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS AGENT FOR PORT ARTHUR INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, BOBBY FEEMSTER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS AGENT FOR PORT ARTHUR INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, DONALD FRANK, INDIVIDUALLY AND*
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/08/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
10/06/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
05/15/2003 | Amended motion for rehearing | Petitioner | petitioners' amended mo/re | |
05/02/2003 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | on behalf of Klein & Associates Political Relations, ET AL. | |
03/18/2003 | Response to Petition | Respondent | On behalf of respondent's, Melody Thomas and Wells, Peyton, Greenberg, & Hunt | |
03/17/2003 | Response to Petition | Respondent | on behalf of Port Arthur ISD, Willie Mae Elmore, Bobby Feemster, Donald Frank, Gregory Flores, Mattie Londow and Ray Meador | |
02/13/2003 | Redrafted Petition for Review | Petitioner | Redraft petition filed on behalf of Klein & Associates ET AL. | |
02/03/2003 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached to petition | |
02/03/2003 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Klein & Associates Political Relations, ET AL. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/08/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
10/06/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
08/01/2003 | Case Stored | G02/25-A-2 | | |
07/31/2003 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order mailed to the court of appeals. | | |
06/05/2003 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | as amended | |
05/15/2003 | Amended motion for rehearing | petitioners' amended mo/re | | |
05/02/2003 | Motion for Rehearing | on behalf of Klein & Associates Political Relations, ET AL. | | |
05/02/2003 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's office | | |
04/17/2003 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | as redrafted. | |
03/18/2003 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/18/2003 | Response to Petition | On behalf of respondent's, Melody Thomas and Wells, Peyton, Greenberg, & Hunt | | |
03/17/2003 | Response to Petition | on behalf of Port Arthur ISD, Willie Mae Elmore, Bobby Feemster, Donald Frank, Gregory Flores, Mattie Londow and Ray Meador | | |
02/13/2003 | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | | |
02/13/2003 | Redrafted Petition for Review | Redraft petition filed on behalf of Klein & Associates ET AL. | | |
02/10/2003 | Description of document returned to Supreme Court | Postcard to Mr. J. Keith Stanley. Remailed to P.O. Box address. | | |
02/06/2003 | Petition for Review disposed | Filed document is struck by the Court | Petitioner is order to redraw; See T.R.A.P 53.6 AND 53.2(K)(1)(C); Redrafted petition due n/l/t 5:00 p.m., February 17, 2003. | |
02/06/2003 | Redrafted Pet/Review due to be filed | Redrafted petition due n/l/t 5:00 p.m., February 17, 2003. | | |
02/06/2003 | Returned document(s). See Remarks. | 10 copies of struck pet/review returned to petitioner this date. | | |
02/03/2003 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached to petition | | |
02/03/2003 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Klein & Associates Political Relations, ET AL. | | |
02/03/2003 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to Keith Stanley, left mgs with his assistant, he needs to send the trial cour judgment. Copies of pet. for review went down. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
08/01/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/25-A-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PORT ARTHUR INDEPENDENT SCHOO | Respondent | Mr. Christopher B. Gilbert |
FEEMSTER, BOBBY | Respondent | Mr. Christopher B. Gilbert |
KLEIN INVESTMENTS | Petitioner | Mr. J. Keith Stanley |
KLEIN & ASSOCIATES POLITICAL R | Petitioner | Mr. J. Keith Stanley |
FRANK, DONALD | Respondent | Mr. Christopher B. Gilbert |
ELMORE, WILLIE MAE | Respondent | Mr. Christopher B. Gilbert |
THOMAS, MELODY | Respondent | Mr. Lawrence L. Germer |
SOUTHEAST TEXAS POLITICAL REVI | Petitioner | Mr. J. Keith Stanley |
FLORES, GREGORY | Respondent | Mr. Christopher B. Gilbert |
MEADOR, RAY | Respondent | Mr. Christopher B. Gilbert |
WELLS PAYTON GREENBERG & HUNT | Respondent | Ms. Heather Anne Montgomery |
KLEIN, PHILIP R. | Petitioner | Mr. J. Keith Stanley |
LONDO, MATTIE | Respondent | Mr. Christopher B. Gilbert |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-01-00562-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
92 SW3d 889, 12-19-02
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable DAVID GAULTNEY
Trial Court Information
172nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable James W. Mehaffy
A-163290