Case: B-20
B-20
01/03/1967
Application for Writ of Error
NEW AMSTERDAM CASUALTY COMPANY
TEXAS INDUSTRIES, INC.,DBA TEXCRETE STRUCTURAL PRODUCTS COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/15/1967 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
05/04/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
03/08/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/20/1967 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
01/03/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/15/1967 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
05/04/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/26/1967 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/08/1967 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/20/1967 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
02/15/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
01/03/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/03/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
New Amsterdam Casualty Company | Petitioner | |
Texas Industries, Inc.,dba Texcrete Structural Products Company | Respondent | |
Firemans Fund Insurance Company and National Surety Corporation, et al. | Amicus Curiae | |
Bill Atkins | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information