Case: B-24
B-24
01/06/1967
Application for Writ of Error
HARDWARE DEALERS MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
AGNES L. KING
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/15/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
04/05/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/23/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/06/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/1968 | Motion to Withdraw Filed | | ||
04/23/1968 | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | | ||
03/20/1968 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
03/20/1968 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/15/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
12/13/1967 | Motion to Argue filed | | ||
04/05/1967 | Response to Petition | | ||
03/22/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/21/1967 | Motion to Strike filed | | ||
03/20/1967 | Supplement or amendment to application. | | ||
02/22/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/10/1967 | Notice of Appearance | | ||
01/23/1967 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/06/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/06/1967 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hardware Dealers Mutual Fire Insurance Company | Petitioner | |
Agnes L. King | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information