Case: 02-95-00169-CV
02-95-00169-CV
08/14/1995
Contract
Ishin Speed Sport, Inc.
Rutherford, Johnny and Johnny Rutherford, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/30/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/07/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/08/1996 | Other Document Filed | | |
10/08/1996 | Submitted | | |
10/08/1996 | Submission | | |
10/01/1996 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
03/05/1996 | Motion for Continuance Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/05/1996 | Motion for Continuance Filed | | |
03/01/1996 | Brief Filed | | |
03/01/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/14/1996 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/09/1996 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
01/09/1996 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/04/1996 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
11/13/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
09/18/1995 | Submission | | |
09/13/1995 | Exhibits Filed | | |
09/13/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
08/25/1995 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/23/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
08/14/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
08/14/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/30/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ishin Speed Sport, Inc. | Appellant | Neil D. Kelly |
Rutherford, Johnny | Appellee | H. Allen Pennington, Jr. |
Johnny Rutherford, Inc. | Appellee | H. Allen Pennington, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
342nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Bob S. McGrath
342-143428-92