judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SHELL OIL COMPANY, CAMPBELL GROUP, HUMPREYS GROUP, KARTEN GROUP, DAVIS GROUP AND CLAUD B. HAMILL, SHELL OIL COMPANY, HUMPHREYS GROUP, KARSTEN GROUP, DAVIS GROUP AND CLAUD B. HAMILL v. GULF OIL CORPORATION AND KIRBY LUMBER CORPORATION

Case: B-36
B-36
01/10/1967
Application for Writ of Error
SHELL OIL COMPANY, CAMPBELL GROUP, HUMPREYS GROUP, KARTEN GROUP, DAVIS GROUP AND CLAUD B. HAMILL, SHELL OIL COMPANY, HUMPHREYS GROUP, KARSTEN GROUP, DAVIS GROUP AND CLAUD B. HAMILL
GULF OIL CORPORATION AND KIRBY LUMBER CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
04/20/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/18/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/25/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
01/10/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/10/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/10/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
06/14/1967Letter Filed
04/24/1967Response to Motion filed
04/20/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/18/1967Motion for Rehearing
01/25/1967Response to Petition
01/10/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/10/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/10/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/10/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Campbell GroupPetitioner
Shell Oil Company, Humphreys Group, Karsten Group, Davis Group and Claud B. HamillPetitioner
Humpreys Group, Karten Group, Davis Group and Claud B. HamillPetitioner
Shell Oil CompanyPetitioner
Gulf Oil Corporation and Kirby Lumber CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information