judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURKETT (THEODORE) VS. STATE C/W 32273, 35637

Case Information: 34706
Short Caption:BURKETT (THEODORE) VS. STATE C/W 32273, 35637Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 32273 *, 34706, 35637 Related Case(s): 32273 , 38086
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C52477Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/13/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07866
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34688, 34691, 34693, 34706, 34715, 34716, 34738. 99-09625
01/13/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 01/10/00. 00-00572
01/13/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn5[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 32273, 34706, 35637. 01-05000
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14492
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14492