judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TELA NICOLE THOMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0747
Short Caption:TELA NICOLE THOMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bribery
Lead: 10-CF-0612 Consolidated:10-CF-0747
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-9388-09Filed Date:06/15/2010

Opening Event Date:06/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/12/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/29/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/02/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTela Nicole Thompson Y
Deborah A. PersicoYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/30/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal nos. 10-CF-612 and 10-CF-747 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Deborah A. Persico, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Tela N. Thompson in appeal no. 10-CF-747. F/O that counsel for appellant Tela N. Thompson shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Divsion to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/30/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Deborah A. Persico, Esquire
07/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (10-CF-747) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
11/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (SMITH) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
11/29/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript (smith)
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (84 pgs/White) 11/3/09 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (18 pgs/Maar) 12/7/09 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (129 pgs/Walker) 2/17/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (292 pgs/Jeon) 2/24/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (260 pgs/Jeon) 2/25/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (261-552 pgs/Jeon) 3/1/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (553-1138 pgs/Jeon) 3/2-4/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (236 pgs/Burr) 3/8/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (237-540 pgs/Burr) 3/9/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (541-803 pgs/Burr) 3/10/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (804-967 pgs/Burr) 3/11/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (968-1276 pgs/Burr) 3/12/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (271 pgs/Maddox) 3/15/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (272-513 pgs/Maddox) 3/16/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (514-629 pgs/Maddox) 3/17/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (6 pgs/Walker) 3/18/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (32 pgs/Walker) 3/19/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (20 pgs/Wood) 3/22/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #19 (45 pgs/Allison) 3/23/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #20 pgs/Wood - 3/24/10 proc.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #21 (29 pgs/tape) 5/21/10 proc. a.m.
11/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #22 (40 pgs/tape) 5/21/10 proc. w/cd
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-612)
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-612)
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #23 (sealed documents)
12/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii) (10-CF-612)
12/22/2010RECEIVED- motion for appeal transcript (10-CF-612)
02/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #24 (27 pgs/Janifer) 1/26/09 proc.
02/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #25 (206 pgs/Jeon) 2/22/10 proc. w/cd
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #26 (34 pgs/Rogers) 5/1/09 proc.
04/14/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #27 (SEALED orders sealing bench conf)
04/14/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CF-747)
04/14/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CF-747)
04/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/13/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
05/13/2011APPENDIX (smith)
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 12/6/11. (Thompson) no oppo
06/08/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to co-appellant's MAXB (Alton Smith
06/08/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION- to motion to co-aplt's motion for six months extension of time within which to file brief for co - aplt) filed by (Thompson)
06/10/2011 On consideration of appellant Tela Nichole Thompson's unopposed motion for extension of time to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant Thompson's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 6, 2011. (Castillo)
12/06/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record - with government exhibits (transcripts) (Thompson) (Appellant)Granted
12/06/2011LodgedMiscellaneous - Supplemental record of government exhibits (transcripts) (Appellant)
12/06/2011FiledBrief (Thompson) (Appellant)
12/06/2011FiledAppendix (Thompson) (Appellant)
12/19/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellant Thompson's motion to supplement the record
12/23/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #28 (Gvt exhibits 83,86 & 88 (a)
01/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 3/12/12.
03/12/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record w/cd attached (Appellee)Granted
03/12/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/12/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/13/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Supplement The Record.
03/16/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #29 (government's exhibits (appendix A,B,C,D)
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
04/04/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
04/06/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/12/2012FiledMotion to postponse scheduling oral argumant (Thompson) (Appellant)Granted
04/13/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
05/03/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion to postponse scheduling oral argumant (Thompson)
05/18/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
06/19/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
06/26/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Thompson) (Appellant)
06/27/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee, US)
08/20/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant - Thompson)
09/27/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File (Thompson) Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Leave to File (Thompson) Reply Brief (Appellant)
10/02/2012FiledReply Brief (Thompson) (Appellant)
11/29/2012FiledArgued Before Washington,Blackburne-Rigsby,Nebeker, Bruce A. Johnson Esq.,for appellant Alton L. Smith, Debrorah A. Persico Esq.,for appellant Tela Nicole Thompson, Angela G. Schmidt Esq.,for appellee.
06/06/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
07/02/2013FiledMandate
07/11/2013FiledMOTION FOR FAIR TRIAL REHEARING (10CF612) ******CONSTRUED AS MOTION TO RECALL MANDATEDenied
07/12/2013FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
09/05/2013FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
10/04/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE (10CF612)
12/04/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)