judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANA GORDON SPANG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0096)
Case Number:S-07-0096Case Docketed On:04/30/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:DANA GORDON SPANG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANA GORDON SPANG, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDana Gordon SpangDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/30/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/18/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/18/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/09/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
08/10/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal