Case: B-0012
B-0012
01/02/1967
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN B. COFFEE, ET AL.
WILLIAM MARSH RICE UNIVERSITY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | Petitioners' Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of John B. Coffee, et al. | |
01/17/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Respondents' Reply to Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of William Marsh Rice University, et al. | |
01/02/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of John B. Coffee, et al. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioners' Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of John B. Coffee, et al. | ||
01/17/1967 | Response to Petition | Respondents' Reply to Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of William Marsh Rice University, et al. | ||
01/02/1967 | Case Record Filed | | ||
01/02/1967 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Application for Writ of Error filed on behalf of John B. Coffee, et al. | ||
06/01/1966 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | | |
04/27/1966 | Opinion issued | Court of Appeals' judgment reversed; cause remanded to trial court | Opinion of the Court delivered by Justice Greenhill | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Coffee, John B. | Petitioner | |
William Marsh Rice University, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information