Case: A-6870
A-6870
05/26/1958
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
STATE BOARD OF INSURANCE, ET AL.
HORACE WIMBERLY AND A. M. LECROIX, V. F. TAYLOR, CHARLES O. BETTS, HON. CHARLES O. BETTS, JUDGE OF THE 98TH DISTRICT COURT OF TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/28/1958 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
06/26/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | Relator | | |
06/24/1958 | Response to Reply filed | Respondent | | |
06/21/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
06/21/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/21/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/20/1958 | Reply to Response | Relator | | |
06/18/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/11/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Relator | | |
06/04/1958 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | | |
05/26/1958 | Brief in Support of Petition | Relator | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/18/1958 | Judgment from the Court of Appeals | | ||
07/16/1958 | Concurring Opinion issued. | | ||
07/16/1958 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
07/16/1958 | Opinion issued | | ||
06/28/1958 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
06/26/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
06/25/1958 | Miscellaneous letter | | ||
06/24/1958 | Response to Reply filed | | ||
06/21/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
06/21/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/21/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/20/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
06/18/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/11/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
06/11/1958 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | Filing granted | | |
06/11/1958 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
06/04/1958 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | | ||
05/30/1958 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
05/30/1958 | Motion to dismiss | | ||
05/27/1958 | Motion to dismiss | | ||
05/26/1958 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
05/26/1958 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State Board of Insurance, et al. | Relator | |
Hon. Charles O. Betts, Judge of the 98th District Court of Travis County, Texas, et al. | Respondent | |
Charles O. Betts | Respondent | |
Horace Wimberly and A. M. LeCroix | Respondent | |
V. F. Taylor | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information