Case: A-6882
A-6882
06/02/1958
Application for Writ of Error
MYRTLE B. SOWELL FENN
HOWARD E. BOXWELL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/19/1958 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
06/16/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/02/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/31/1958 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/30/1958 | Motion for leave to file brief | Denied | | |
07/08/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/19/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
06/16/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/02/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/02/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Howard E. Boxwell | Respondent | |
Myrtle B. Sowell Fenn | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information