Case: 03-98-00213-CR
03-98-00213-CR
04/17/1998
Assault
Thomas Stuckey
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/13/2000 | CASE STORED | | |||||
02/04/1999 | Mandate Acknowledgment | | |||||
01/08/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
11/13/1998 | Docketing statement received | | |||||
09/17/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
08/17/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/04/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
06/30/1998 | Appellant's brief overdue notice in criminal case | | |||||
06/26/1998 | Docketing statement received | | |||||
06/16/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
06/16/1998 | Docketing statement to appellant's counsel | | |||||
06/16/1998 | Response requested (postcard) | | |||||
06/01/1998 | Notice received | | |||||
05/18/1998 | Response received | | |||||
05/12/1998 | Clerk's Record Overdue | | |||||
04/17/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
04/17/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/08/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Ronald Earle |
Stuckey, Thomas Nathaniel | Appellant | Mr. Erik S. Goodman |
State Prosecuting Attorney | Interested party | The Honorable Matthew W. Paul |
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable Michael F. Lynch
0972234
8 yrs. (DEFERRED ADJUD.)