Case: 01-90-01142-CV
01-90-01142-CV
12/17/1990
Miscellaneous/other civil
St. James Transportation Co., Inc., & Waterways Co., et al
James Porter
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/15/1993 | Mandate issued | | |
03/31/1993 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
03/24/1993 | Writ disposed | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
12/08/1992 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
12/03/1992 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
11/23/1992 | Writ filed | | |
11/23/1992 | Writ filed | | |
10/22/1992 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Grant motion | |
10/22/1992 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
10/22/1992 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
10/05/1992 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
09/29/1992 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
09/17/1992 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
09/17/1992 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
08/26/1992 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
07/17/1992 | Memorandum of authorities | | |
07/15/1992 | Submitted | | |
07/15/1992 | Supplemental brief filed | | |
07/15/1992 | Submission | | |
07/15/1992 | Submitted | | |
07/13/1992 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
07/10/1992 | Motion to strike filed | | |
07/10/1992 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
07/09/1992 | Original proceedings: Reply Brief filed | | |
06/12/1992 | Submission | | |
12/20/1991 | Motion to reset submission filed | | |
12/11/1991 | Submission | | |
11/07/1991 | Motion to reset submission disposed | Grant motion | |
11/01/1991 | Motion to reset submission filed | | |
10/14/1991 | Submission | | |
06/27/1991 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
06/27/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/27/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/06/1991 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
05/28/1991 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
05/24/1991 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
05/02/1991 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
05/02/1991 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
04/22/1991 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
04/04/1991 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
03/19/1991 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
02/19/1991 | Filing fee paid | | |
02/19/1991 | Statement of facts filed | | |
02/07/1991 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
01/31/1991 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
01/28/1991 | Filing fee paid | | |
01/25/1991 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
01/25/1991 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
01/17/1991 | Filing fee paid | | |
01/17/1991 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
01/03/1991 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
12/31/1990 | Filing fee paid | | |
12/21/1990 | Filing fee paid | | |
12/17/1990 | Transcript filed | | |
12/17/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
11/19/1990 | Appeal bond filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/15/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Appellee | John Roberson |
State | Appellant | Bernard H. Ticer |
State | Appellant | Thomas C. Fitzhugh III |
State | Appellant | Roger D. Townsend |
State | Appellee | Robert E. Lapin |
State | Appellee | Hon. J. Graham Hill |
Trial Court Information
129th District Court
Harris
87-19393