judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUNCAN (MICHELLE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34697
Short Caption:DUNCAN (MICHELLE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR970454Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07768
09/08/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Jack Alian shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-08434
10/20/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10249
10/20/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10250
11/05/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-10866
03/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court has concluded that the transcript of the August 12, 1999 probation revocation hearing is necessary for resolution of the appeal. Appellant's counsel shall file and serve a rough draft transcript request form pursuant to NRAP 3C(d)(3) within 10 days of this order. 00-04712
05/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Appellant's counsel shall file and serve a rough draft transcript request form within 5 days of this order. Also, appellant's counsel shall show cause within 20 days of this order why this court should not impose sanctions for counsel's failure to comply with this court's March 23, 2000, order and NRAP 3C(d)(3). 00-08329
05/22/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Fast Track Statement/Rough Draft Transcript. 00-08524
07/05/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn2[On May 18, 2000, we ordered, for the second time, Mr. Alian to file and serve a rough draft request form, and we ordered Mr. Alian to show cuase why this court should not impose sanctions for his failure to comply with the prior order. Mr. Alian has failed to show cause. Mr. Alian shall pay the sum of $100.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of said payment within 20 days of this order.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-11448
08/01/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13279
08/01/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Proof of Payment of Sanction in the amount of $100.00 from attorney Jack A. Alian-check no. 1191. "MISSING" 00-13453
08/08/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 2, 2000. 00-13279