judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANE JACOBSON v. KENNETH F.B. COBBS, M.D.

Case Heading (06-83)
Case Number:06-83Case Docketed On:04/13/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law
Short Title:DANE JACOBSON v. KENNETH F.B. COBBS, M.D.
Full Title:DANE JACOBSON, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. KENNETH F.B. COBBS, M.D., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDane JacobsonWilliam R. Fix
Jenna V. Mandraccia
AppelleeKenneth F.B. CobbsJeffrey C. Brinkerhoff
Nick Andrew Swartzendruber

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 99
Citation:160 P.3d 654

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/13/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/13/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/13/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/31/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
07/10/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/02/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volumes I&II, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/02/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/11/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/04/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacate - faxed copy.MotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/05/2006Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
10/06/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacate - original.MotionOral argument - vacateFinal
11/06/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/06/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacate - faxed copy.MotionOral argument - vacateFinal
12/06/2006Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
12/08/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacate - original.MotionOral argument - vacateFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Jenna V. Mandraccia for appellant; Jeffrey C. Brinkerhoff for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/19/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/06/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal