Case: A-6880
A-6880
05/29/1958
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
MYRTLE MCCASLIN, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/28/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
11/07/1958 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
11/03/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
10/09/1958 | Errata Filed | Respondent | | |
10/01/1958 | Amended Response to Petition for Review filed | Respondent | | |
06/07/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
05/29/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/23/1959 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/10/1959 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
03/18/1959 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/17/1959 | Letter Filed | | ||
01/07/1959 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
12/22/1958 | Miscellaneous Motion | Filing granted | | |
12/05/1958 | Letter Filed | | ||
11/28/1958 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/12/1958 | Opinion issued | | ||
11/07/1958 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/03/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
10/09/1958 | Errata Filed | | ||
10/01/1958 | Amended Response to Petition for Review filed | | ||
09/30/1958 | Letter Filed | | ||
07/09/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/07/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/29/1958 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/29/1958 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Myrtle McCaslin, et vir | Respondent | |
Texas Employers Insurance Association | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information