Case: A-6901
A-6901
06/12/1958
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
STATE BOARD OF INSURANCE, ET AL.
V. F. TAYLOR, CHARLES O. BETTS, HON. CHARLES O. BETTS, 98TH DISTRICT COURT, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/18/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Respondent | | |
07/11/1958 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | Respondent | | |
07/02/1958 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | Relator | | |
07/01/1958 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/28/1958 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
06/26/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | Relator | | |
06/25/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | Relator | | |
06/24/1958 | Reply to Response | Relator | | |
06/21/1958 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
06/21/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/21/1958 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
06/20/1958 | Reply to Response | Relator | | |
06/20/1958 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
06/17/1958 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/13/1958 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | | |
06/12/1958 | Brief in Support of Petition | Relator | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/18/1958 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
07/16/1958 | Concurring Opinion issued. | | ||
07/16/1958 | Concurring Opinion issued. | | ||
07/16/1958 | Opinion issued | | ||
07/11/1958 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | | ||
07/02/1958 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | | ||
07/01/1958 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
06/28/1958 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
06/26/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
06/25/1958 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
06/24/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
06/21/1958 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
06/21/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/21/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
06/20/1958 | Reply to Response | | ||
06/20/1958 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
06/17/1958 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/13/1958 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | | ||
06/13/1958 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
06/12/1958 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
06/12/1958 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Charles O. Betts | Respondent | |
State Board of Insurance, et al. | Relator | |
Hon. Charles O. Betts, 98th District Court, Travis County, Texas, et al. | Respondent | |
Joe A. Keith | Amicus Curiae | |
V. F. Taylor | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information