Case: 95-0558
95-0558
06/12/1995
App Writ of Error
SHERWOOD E. BLOUNT JR.
L.H. LACY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/22/1995 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
06/12/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/15/1995 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Mo/Re filed | | |
10/12/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | with the notation, "Writ Denied." | |
06/28/1995 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
06/22/1995 | Reply to Response | | | |
06/12/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/15/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
L.H. LACY COMPANY | Respondent | Mr. Aubyn K. Shettle Jr. |
BLOUNT, JR., SHERWOOD E. | Petitioner | Mr. Charles M. Meadows Jr. |
VENTURECORP PROPERTIES, INC. | Petitioner | Mr. Wayne R. Miller |
MCDERMOTT DRIVE JOINT VENTURE | Petitioner | Mr. M. Todd Welty |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-94-01361-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 03-23-95
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable WILL BARBER
Trial Court Information
366th District Court
Collin
366-1881-89