Case: A-10961
A-10961
07/29/1965
Application for Writ of Error
FORTH WORTH CONCRETE COMPANY
STATE OF TEXAS AND TARRANT COUNTY, TEXAS, E. F. ABBOTT, EULA ABBOTT, E. E. NEWMAN AND IDA NEWMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/23/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
02/22/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
01/12/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
08/31/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/06/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/29/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/23/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/22/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/09/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
01/12/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
10/06/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/31/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/06/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/29/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/29/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas and Tarrant County, Texas | Respondent | |
Forth Worth Concrete Company | Petitioner | |
E. F. Abbott, Eula Abbott, E. E. Newman and Ida Newman | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information