judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

STONE, PRINCE WARREN

Case: PD-0305-94
PD-0305-94
03/17/1994
PDR Case Type
STONE, PRINCE WARREN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/01/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/02/1994FINAL DISPRefused
05/18/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/18/1994PDR DISPRefused
04/01/1994RESPONSE FILED
03/17/1994PDR FILED
03/17/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/14/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateDaniel C. Rice
Stone, Prince WarrenApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Michael A. McDougal
Court of Appeals Information:
09-91-00277-CR
REV & REM (PUNISH) 2-16-94
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
359th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable ERWIN ERNST
91-08-00974-CR