judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WILLIAM L. RICHARDS v. WELDON J. ALLEN

Case: A-10963
A-10963
07/30/1965
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM L. RICHARDS
WELDON J. ALLEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/15/1965Response to PetitionRespondent
07/30/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/16/1966Opinion issued
11/03/1965Document received (See Remarks)
09/15/1965Response to Petition
08/20/1965Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
07/30/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/30/1965Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William L. RichardsPetitioner
Weldon J. AllenRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information