Case: 14-94-00253-CR
14-94-00253-CR
03/17/1994
All Misdemeanors
Martinez, Carlos
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/18/1994 | Case stored | | |
04/14/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/14/1994 | Motion to withdraw appeal DISPOSED - ANT,APE | GRANTED | |
04/14/1994 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
04/14/1994 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
04/14/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/13/1994 | Submitted | | |
04/13/1994 | Submission | | |
04/13/1994 | Submitted | | |
04/08/1994 | Motion to withdraw appeal FILED | | |
03/17/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/11/1994 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
02/28/1994 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/18/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes, Jr. |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Dennis Spurling |
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 1
Harris
Honorable Zona Jones
93-13388
$2000 fine & 30 dys.