judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

REAVES BECKER COMPANY v. WILKES COMPANY

Case: A-10957
A-10957
07/27/1965
Application for Writ of Error
REAVES BECKER COMPANY
WILKES COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
11/17/1965Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/05/1965Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/06/1965Response to PetitionRespondent
07/27/1965Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
11/19/1965Response to Motion filed
11/17/1965Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/05/1965Reply to Response
08/06/1965Response to Petition
07/27/1965Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/27/1965Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Reaves Becker CompanyPetitioner
Wilkes CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information