judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. H. ROSE, J. D. WHARTON v. JAMES B. BAKER

Case: A-162
A-162
04/29/1944
Application for Writ of Error
J. H. ROSE, J. D. WHARTON
JAMES B. BAKER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/15/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/13/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/06/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/20/1945Opinion issued
12/07/1944Letter Filed
11/15/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/13/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/06/1944Bond
05/31/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/06/1944Brief on the Merits
04/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/29/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. D. WhartonPetitioner
James B. BakerRespondent
J. H. RosePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information