judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DUBAR, MARVA R. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-1228
Short Caption:DUBAR, MARVA R. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:09/04/1981

Opening Event Date:09/04/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/29/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/1984
Argued/Submitted:11/07/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
David M. Becker NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michael R. DreebenYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Bradley L. KellyYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DUBAR, MARVA R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 DREEBENM PRO HAC VICE
09/04/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/29/1983FiledRecord Completed
07/25/1984FiledBriefing Completed
11/07/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/21/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition