judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KORT KINSTLER v. RTB SOUTH GREELEY, LTD. LLC

Case Heading (06-218)
Case Number:06-218Case Docketed On:09/25/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:KORT KINSTLER v. RTB SOUTH GREELEY, LTD. LLC
Full Title:KORT KINSTLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. RTB SOUTH GREELEY, LTD. LLC, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKort Kinstler Pro Se
AppelleeRTB South Greeley, Ltd. LLCDale W. Cottam
Lindsay Ann Woznick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 98
Citation:160 P.3d 1125

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/25/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/25/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/20/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/21/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/04/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/05/2006Order - Grant - third extension of time - no furtherOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
12/18/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/22/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/28/2006Event - Other - counsel for appellee came to make copy of brief, stated they were not served with a copy of brief. Changed briefing date to 45 days from today to file brief.EventOtherFinal
02/13/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
02/16/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/05/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/06/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/15/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes: Volumes I through III, original papers; Volume IV, transcripts; Volume V, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
06/19/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/02/2007Motion - Fees and costs (pursuant to opinion) wrong caption on pleadingMotionFees and costsFinal
07/02/2007Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
07/02/2007Brief - Other covering points and authorities upon which appeallant (sic) relies to rehear appealBriefOtherFinal
07/17/2007Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs (pursuant to opinion)OrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
07/17/2007Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/17/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/20/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/19/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal