Case: A-10945
A-10945
07/26/1965
Application for Writ of Error
GRANITE STATE FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
ARCHIE M. ROBERTS, BOYD L. PEARSON, JR. AND UNITED STATES CASUALTY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/02/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/26/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/22/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/20/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/15/1965 | Motion for production of documents filed | Overruled | | |
08/02/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/26/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/26/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Archie M. Roberts | Respondent | |
Boyd L. Pearson, Jr. and United States Casualty Company | Respondent | |
Granite State Fire Insurance Company | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information