Case: 94-0261
94-0261
03/17/1994
Three applications filed. See Remarks.
OWENS-ILLINOIS INC. FIBREBOARD CORP. KEENE CORP. AND PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORP.
CLYDE SPIKES and RUBY SPIKES ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
04/28/1994 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | Behalf of Fibreboard Corp., Thomas M. Peterson, One Market Street, Spear St. Tower, San Francisco, Ca. 94105 also filed in case # 94-0259 & 94-0262 | |
04/21/1994 | Reply to Response | Respondent | Behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01 | |
04/04/1994 | Reply to Response | Respondent | BEHALF/CLYDE AND RUBY SPIKES | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | on behalf of Keene CorporationSequence #: 02 | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | on behalf of Pittsburgh Corning CorporationSequence #: 03 | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | on behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01 | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/25/1995 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Brief missing Misc/Mo 4/29/94 | | |
06/22/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
06/22/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
06/22/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | Of Pittsburg-Corning Corp. | |
06/22/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | Of Keene, Corp. | |
06/22/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Three applications for writ of error denied. | Of Owens-Illinois, Inc. | |
05/19/1994 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Filing granted | MO F/ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AS TO ATTYS THOS PETERSON & MEREDITH LANDY OF SAN FRANCISCO, CA, ATTYS F/FIBREBOARD | |
05/17/1994 | Petitioner's reply brief | Behalf of Pittsburgh Corning Corp.Sequence #: 03 | | |
04/29/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion for admission pro hac vice filed by James Powers have of amicus Fibreboard Corp. for "Thomas Peterson; also filed in case 94-0259 & 94-0262 | | |
04/28/1994 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Behalf of Fibreboard Corp., Thomas M. Peterson, One Market Street, Spear St. Tower, San Francisco, Ca. 94105 also filed in case # 94-0259 & 94-0262 | | |
04/28/1994 | Notice requesting filing fee | $30 Motion for admission pro hac vice filed in cases 94-0259, 94-0261 & 94-0262 | | |
04/21/1994 | Reply to Response | Behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01 | | |
04/07/1994 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
04/04/1994 | Reply to Response | BEHALF/CLYDE AND RUBY SPIKES | | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | on behalf of Keene CorporationSequence #: 02 | | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | on behalf of Pittsburgh Corning CorporationSequence #: 03 | | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | on behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01 | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/25/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BEN, CLARENCE | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
POLUMBO, GLORIA | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
BEN, EDNORA | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. | Petitioner | Mr. Robert E. Barfield Mr. David W. Starnes Mr. James D. Miller Mr. Richard L. Scheer Ms. Kerrie C. Dent |
MORRIS, HELEN | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
BLEDSOE, ELLOIS | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
ESTATE OF OTIS BURT | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
SPIKES, CLYDE | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
MORRIS, JAMES | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
HUNTER, KATHY | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
BURT, MABLE | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
SRITE, ERMA | Respondent | Mr. Richard N. Countiss |
KEENE CORPORATION | Petitioner | Mr. James H. Powers Mr. Kenneth C. Baker Ms. Shelley Hutson |
BURT, RONALD | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
FIBREBOARD CORPORATION | Petitioner | Mr. Thomas M. Peterson Ms. Meredith N. Landy Mr. James H. Powers |
PITTSBURGH CORNING CORPORATION | Petitioner | Mr. Nicholas S. Baldo Mr. Michael K. Rose Mr. Jeffrey S. Boyd Mr. G. Luke Ashley Mr. John Cummings |
SPIKES, RUBY | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
JOCHIM, MARY | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
SRITE, JAMES F. | Respondent | Mr. Richard N. Countiss |
PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORP. | Petitioner | Mr. R. Lyn Stevens Mr. John Cummings |
BLEDSOE, ROBERT E. | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
BELL, MICKEY | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
FRILEY, JOSEPH | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
BELL, JAMES H. | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
JOCHIM, RAYMOND | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
FRILEY, ERMA RAE | Respondent | Mr. John E. Williams Jr. |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-92-00288-CV
Rev'd & Remanded/Aff'd
870 SW2d 556, 11-18-93
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable ADELE HEDGES
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
Honorable Ann Tyrrell Cochran
86-05733