judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES L. and PAMELA H. BENTLEY v. DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF STATE LANDS AND INVESTMENTS; LYNNE BOOMGAARDEN, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of State Lands and Investments; BOARD OF LAND COMMISSIONERS; GOVERNOR DAVE FREUDENTHAL, SECRETARY OF STATE JOSEPH B. MEYER, AUDITOR MAX MAXFIELD, TREASURER CYNTHIA LUMMIS, and SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION JIM McBRIDE, in their official capacities as members of the Board of Land Commissioners; WYOMING GAME AND FISH COMMISSION; WYOMING GAME AND FISH DEPARTMENT; and TERRY CLEVELAND, in his official capacity as Director of the Wyoming Game and Fish Department

Case Heading (06-131)
Case Number:06-131Case Docketed On:06/09/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:JAMES L. and PAMELA H. BENTLEY v. DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF STATE LANDS AND INVESTMENTS; LYNNE BOOMGAARDEN, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of State Lands and Investments; BOARD OF LAND COMMISSIONERS; GOVERNOR DAVE FREUDENTHAL, SECRETARY OF STATE JOSEPH B. MEYER, AUDITOR MAX MAXFIELD, TREASURER CYNTHIA LUMMIS, and SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION JIM McBRIDE, in their official capacities as members of the Board of Land Commissioners; WYOMING GAME AND FISH COMMISSION; WYOMING GAME AND FISH DEPARTMENT; and TERRY CLEVELAND, in his official capacity as Director of the Wyoming Game and Fish Department
Full Title:JAMES L. and PAMELA H. BENTLEY, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF STATE LANDS AND INVESTMENTS; LYNNE BOOMGAARDEN, in her official capacity as Director of the Office of State Lands and Investments; BOARD OF LAND COMMISSIONERS; GOVERNOR DAVE FREUDENTHAL, SECRETARY OF STATE JOSEPH B. MEYER, AUDITOR MAX MAXFIELD, TREASURER CYNTHIA LUMMIS, and SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION JIM McBRIDE, in their official capacities as members of the Board of Land Commissioners; WYOMING GAME AND FISH COMMISSION; WYOMING GAME AND FISH DEPARTMENT; and TERRY CLEVELAND, in his official capacity as Director of the Wyoming Game and Fish Department, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames L. BentleyKaren Budd Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
AppellantPamela H. BentleyKaren Budd Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
AppelleeOffice of State Lands and Investments - Director's OfficePatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Christopher Levi Martin
Susan Kay Stipe
Bridget L. Hill

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 94
Citation:160 P.3d 1109

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/09/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/09/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/21/2006Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
09/07/2006Brief - Appellees and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
09/22/2006Brief - Appellants replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/03/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/13/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volume IV, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/16/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court, Brandon L. Jensen for appellants; C. Levi Martin, Sr. Asst. AG, Susan K. Stipe, Sr. Asst. A. G., argument by Ms. Stipe and Mr. Martin appearing on behalf of appellees, and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/16/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/28/2006Event - Phone Call - requested electronic copy of brief of appellant; received cd this date.EventPhone CallFinal
06/08/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/26/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/26/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/28/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 6/27/07 by L. Glode.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal