Case: 94-0260
94-0260
03/17/1994
App Writ of Error
KLECK PLUMBING HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING CO. and McINTOSH CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.
NORTHSIDE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
04/04/1994 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/05/1994 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Mo/Re filed | | |
09/01/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied with Justice not sitting. | W/Justice Spector not sitting. | |
04/07/1994 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
04/04/1994 | Reply to Response | | | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No Mo/Re filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
NORTHSIDE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL | Respondent | Mr. William T. Armstrong III Mr. Emerson Banack Jr. Mr. D. Craig Wood Mr. Robert Russo |
KLECK PLUMBING, HEATING & AIR | Petitioner | Mr. James M. Parker Jr. |
MCINTOSH CONSTRUCTION CO., INC | Petitioner | Mr. James E. Ingram Mr. Fred Schraub |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-92-00359-CV
Rev & Rend/Rev & Rem/Aff
RULE 90, 12-15-93
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
166th District Court
Bexar
Honorable James Barlow
90-CI-07586