Case: 14-94-00260-CV
14-94-00260-CV
03/17/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Holmes, Shanda, Individually and a/n/f of Taeisha Holmes
Holmes, Tamara
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/31/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
03/28/1994 | Case stored | | |
03/24/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/24/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file bond | DENIED | |
03/24/1994 | Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | GRANTED | |
03/24/1994 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
03/24/1994 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
03/24/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/23/1994 | Submitted | | |
03/23/1994 | Submission | | |
03/23/1994 | Submitted | | |
03/17/1994 | Extend time to fild bond FILED - ANT,APE | | |
03/17/1994 | Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | | |
03/17/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
11/15/1993 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
10/18/1993 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/28/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Frank A. Adams |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | Kristine Rollinson |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
566,160