judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC. FIBREBOARD CORP. KEENE CORP. AND PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORP. v. JAMES H. BELL and MICKEY BELL ET AL.

Case: 94-0257
94-0257
03/17/1994
Second App Writ Error
OWENS-ILLINOIS INC. FIBREBOARD CORP. KEENE CORP. AND PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORP.
JAMES H. BELL and MICKEY BELL ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/21/1994Reply to ResponseRespondentBehalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01
04/04/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of Keene CorporationSequence #: 02
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/18/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedTwo applications for writ of error denied.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedon behalf of Keene CorporationSequence #: 02
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedTwo applications for writ of error denied.on behalf of Owens-IllinoisSequence #: 01
04/21/1994Reply to ResponseBehalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01
04/07/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/04/1994Reply to Response
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of Keene CorporationSequence #: 02
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/18/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BURT, MABLERespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
ESTATE OF OTIS BURTRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
FRILEY, JOSEPHRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
SPIKES, RUBYRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BLEDSOE, ROBERT E.RespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BEN, EDNORARespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.PetitionerMr. Richard L. Scheer
Mr. David W. Starnes
Ms. Kerrie C. Dent
Mr. Robert E. Barfield
Mr. James D. Miller
BELL, MICKEYRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BELL, JAMES H.RespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
JOCHIM, RAYMONDRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BURT, RONALDRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
PITTSBURGH CORNING CORPORATIONPetitionerMr. Michael K. Rose
Mr. Jeffrey S. Boyd
Mr. G. Luke Ashley
Mr. Nicholas S. Baldo
FRILEY, ERMA RAERespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
MORRIS, JAMESRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
SPIKES, CLYDERespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
MORRIS, HELENRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BLEDSOE, ELLOISRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
KEENE CORPORATIONPetitionerMr. James H. Powers
Mr. Kenneth C. Baker
Ms. Shelley Hutson
PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORP.PetitionerMr. John Cummings
Mr. R. Lyn Stevens
SRITE, ERMARespondentMr. Richard N. Countiss
FIBREBOARD CORPORATIONPetitionerMr. James H. Powers
HUNTER, KATHYRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
POLUMBO, GLORIARespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
SRITE, JAMES F.RespondentMr. Richard N. Countiss
JOCHIM, MARYRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BEN, CLARENCERespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
01-91-01384-CV
Rev'd & Remanded/Aff'd
870 SW2d 556, 11-18-93
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable ADELE HEDGES
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
Honorable Ann Tyrrell Cochran
85-18235