Case: 02-95-00110-CV
02-95-00110-CV
06/07/1995
Contract
Schieffer, Patricia Penrose, Successor Trustee of the Patricia Penrose Schieffer Testamentary Trust
Bishop, Philip R.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/29/2009 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
02/19/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/13/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
11/15/1996 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
07/12/1996 | Writ Filed | | |
06/20/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
06/14/1996 | Response Filed | | |
06/06/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
05/23/1996 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
12/05/1995 | Submitted | | |
12/05/1995 | Submission | | |
10/24/1995 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
10/09/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
10/09/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/31/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
06/07/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
06/07/1995 | Submission | | |
06/07/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/29/2009 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Schieffer, Patricia Penrose | Appellant | Garrett Morris |
Bishop, Philip R. | Appellee | Hershel R. Payne |
Trial Court Information
352nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable James K. Walker
352-120357-89