Case: 94-0254
94-0254
03/17/1994
App Writ of Error
JEFA COMPANY INC.
MUSTANG TRACTOR AND EQUIPMENT CO. and CATERPILLAR INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/24/1994 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/06/1994 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Mo/Re filed | | |
05/04/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
03/31/1994 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/24/1994 | Reply to Response | | | |
03/17/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/06/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No Mo/Re filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MUSTANG TRACTOR AND EQUIPMENT | Respondent | Mr. Keith D. Peterson Mr. Fred W. Stumpf |
CATERPILLAR, INC. | Respondent | Mr. Gregory J. Commins Jr. Mr. Gregory L. Baker |
JEFA COMPANY, INC. | Petitioner | Mr. Bogdan Rentea |
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
868 SW2d 905, 01-06-94
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable GEORGE T. ELLIS
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable Richard Millard
91-14209