judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC. FIBREBOARD CORP. KEENE CORP. AND PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORP. v. RAYMOND JOCHIM and MARY JOCHIM ET AL.

Case: 94-0253
94-0253
03/17/1994
Second App Writ Error
OWENS-ILLINOIS INC. FIBREBOARD CORP. KEENE CORP. AND PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORP.
RAYMOND JOCHIM and MARY JOCHIM ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/21/1994Reply to ResponseRespondentBehalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01
04/04/1994Reply to ResponseRespondentbehalf/Raymond & Mary Jochim
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of Keene CorporationSequence #: 02
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/18/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedon behalf of Keene CorporationSequence #: 02
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedTwo applications for writ of error denied.on behalf of Owens-IllinoisSequence #: 01
04/21/1994Reply to ResponseBehalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01
04/07/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/04/1994Reply to Responsebehalf/Raymond & Mary Jochim
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of Keene CorporationSequence #: 02
03/17/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of Owens-Illinois, Inc.Sequence #: 01
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/18/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PITTSBURGH-CORNING CORP.PetitionerMr. John Cummings
Mr. R. Lyn Stevens
SRITE, ERMARespondentMr. Richard N. Countiss
BELL, MICKEYRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
HUNTER, KATHYRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BEN, CLARENCERespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BURT, RONALDRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
MORRIS, JAMESRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BLEDSOE, ELLOISRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BELL, JAMES H.RespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
SPIKES, RUBYRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BLEDSOE, ROBERT E.RespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
SRITE, JAMES F.RespondentMr. Richard N. Countiss
SPIKES, CLYDERespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
POLUMBO, GLORIARespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
BURT, MABLERespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
ESTATE OF OTIS BURTRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
JOCHIM, MARYRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
JOCHIM, RAYMONDRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
FRILEY, JOSEPHRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
FRILEY, ERMA RAERespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.PetitionerMs. Kerrie C. Dent
Mr. Richard L. Scheer
Mr. David W. Starnes
Mr. James D. Miller
Ms. Shelley Hutson
Mr. Kenneth C. Baker
Mr. Robert E. Barfield
PITTSBURGH CORNING CORPORATIONPetitionerMr. Jeffrey S. Boyd
Mr. G. Luke Ashley
Mr. Michael K. Rose
Mr. Nicholas S. Baldo
MORRIS, HELENRespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
KEENE CORPORATIONPetitionerMr. James H. Powers
BEN, EDNORARespondentMr. John E. Williams Jr.
FIBREBOARD CORPORATIONPetitionerMr. James H. Powers
Court of Appeals Information:
Rev'd & Remanded/Aff'd
870 SW2d 556, 11-18-93
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable ADELE HEDGES
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
Honorable Ann Tyrrell Cochran
85-50163