Case: A-10959
A-10959
07/29/1965
Application for Writ of Error
EMPLOYERS REINSURANCE CORPORATION
JESSE J. HOLT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/20/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
10/12/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/29/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/10/1967 | Letter Filed | | ||
12/20/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/07/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/07/1966 | Concurring Opinion issued. | | ||
11/24/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/12/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/29/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/29/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jesse J. Holt | Respondent | |
Employers Reinsurance Corporation | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information