Case: A-10958
A-10958
07/29/1965
MISC PETITION
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
CARL SAMPLE, JR., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/12/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
07/05/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/28/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
12/10/1965 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/26/1965 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
11/10/1965 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/01/1965 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/01/1965 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
09/30/1965 | Brief on the Merits | Intervenor | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/12/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
07/05/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
06/28/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/15/1966 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
06/15/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/10/1965 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/26/1965 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
11/16/1965 | Affidavit filed | | ||
11/10/1965 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/01/1965 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/01/1965 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
09/30/1965 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
07/30/1965 | Motion to re-set submission date filed. | Filing granted | | |
07/29/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al. | Appellant | |
Southwestern Life Insurance Company | Amicus Curiae | |
Amerada Petroleum Corporation, Cities Service Oil Company, Humble Oil and Refining Company and Sun Oil Company | Intervenor | |
Railroad Commission of Texas | Appellant | |
Carl Sample, Jr., et al. | Appellee |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information