Case: 01-95-00444-CR
01-95-00444-CR
04/24/1995
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Arguijo, Jr., Johnny Joe
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/15/1998 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
04/15/1998 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
10/16/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/16/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/30/1997 | Submitted | | |
09/30/1997 | Submission | | |
09/30/1997 | Submitted | | |
07/23/1997 | Submission | | |
03/14/1996 | Brief Due | | |
03/14/1996 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
03/14/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/14/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
03/14/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/01/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
02/21/1996 | Brief Due | | |
02/15/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
01/31/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
01/22/1996 | Brief Due | | |
12/28/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
12/18/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
12/17/1995 | Brief Due | | |
11/22/1995 | Brief Due | | |
11/22/1995 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
11/22/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
11/14/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
11/10/1995 | Brief Due | | |
10/12/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/26/1995 | Brief Due | | |
09/26/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
08/17/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
08/12/1995 | Brief Due | | |
08/01/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
07/13/1995 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
07/13/1995 | Statement of facts filed | | |
06/30/1995 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
06/29/1995 | Statement of Facts Due | | |
06/20/1995 | Record due | | |
06/20/1995 | Transcript filed | | |
04/24/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/21/1995 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |
04/21/1995 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/15/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Dan Rizzo John B. Holmes |
TEXAS, THE STATE OF | Criminal - State of Texas | Daniel C. McCrory |
ARGUIJO, JR., JOHNNY JOE | Criminal - Appellant | Robert Morrow |
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM T. HARMON
9408913
50 yrs tdc