Case: 94-0263
94-0263
03/17/1994
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
GEORGE GLOVER M.D.
THE THIRTEENTH COURT OF APPEALS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/28/1994 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Respondent | behalf/real parties - Shearson Lehman Bros,Inc. Greg Palmacci, Dolores Edwards and Ron Gard | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/26/1994 | Case Stored | No Mo/Re filed | | |
06/22/1994 | M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Overruled | | |
03/28/1994 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | behalf/real parties - Shearson Lehman Bros,Inc. Greg Palmacci, Dolores Edwards and Ron Gard | | |
03/25/1994 | Notice requesting filing fee | reply - $5.00 to Bradley W. Foster | | |
03/17/1994 | Exhibits received | Incorporated within M/L/F Pet Mand | | |
03/17/1994 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | | | |
03/17/1994 | Petition for writ received | Incorporated within M/L/F Pet mand | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/26/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No Mo/Re filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
EDWARDS, DOLORES | Respondent | Mr. John D. Murphree |
GLOVER, M.D., GEORGE | Relator | Ms. Cynthia Truax Sheppard Mr. John W. Griffin Jr. |
LEHMAN, SHEARSON | Respondent | Mr. C. W. Flynn |
PALMACCI, GREG | Respondent | Mr. Bradley W. Foster |
LEHMAN BROTHERS, INC. | Respondent | Mr. C. W. Flynn |
GARD, (SHEARSON) RON | Respondent | Mr. John D. Murphree |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-94-00036-CV
Conditionally Granted
___ SW2d ___, 02-28-94
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
267th District Court
Victoria
Honorable Whayland W. Kilgore
93-3-44976-D